Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Task Force to Study the Baltimore Police Department
Sponsored by
Delegate Grammer
Status
In the House - Unfavorable Report by Judiciary; Withdrawn
Analysis
Synopsis
Establishing the Task Force to Study the Baltimore Police Department to investigate the hiring practices of the Department in order to determine the reasons the Department has failed to hire staff in positions where funds have already been allocated; providing for the composition, chair, and staffing of the Task Force; requiring the Task Force to report its findings and recommendations to the Governor and the General Assembly on or before December 1, 2019; etc.
Committees
Original:
Judiciary
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2019
Creates a Task Force or Commission
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/08/2019
Legislative Date
2/08/2019
Action
First Reading Judiciary
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Task Force to Study the Baltimore Police Department
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/11/2019
Legislative Date
2/11/2019
Action
Hearing 2/26 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/21/2019
Legislative Date
2/21/2019
Action
Hearing canceled
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Judiciary
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/25/2019
Legislative Date
2/25/2019
Action
Unfavorable Report by Judiciary; Withdrawn
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/08/2019 2/08/2019 First Reading Judiciary
Text - First - Task Force to Study the Baltimore Police Department
House 2/11/2019 2/11/2019 Hearing 2/26 at 1:00 p.m.
House 2/21/2019 2/21/2019 Hearing canceled
Vote - House - Committee - Judiciary
House 2/25/2019 2/25/2019 Unfavorable Report by Judiciary; Withdrawn
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:31 PM