Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Correctional Officers' Retirement System - Membership
Sponsored by
Delegate M. Jackson
Status
In the House - Hearing 2/27 at 1:00 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Altering the membership of the Correctional Officers' Retirement System to include certain individuals serving in certain positions in the Department of Juvenile Services; providing for the calculation of a certain benefit from the Correctional Officers' Retirement System for individuals serving in certain positions on or before June 30, 2020; requiring the State Retirement Agency, on or before January 1, 2021, to notify the individuals who are affected by the Act of their right to transfer certain service credit; etc.
Committees
Original:
Appropriations  
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0622
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2020
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/31/2020
Legislative Date
1/31/2020
Action
First Reading Appropriations
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Correctional Officers' Retirement System - Membership
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/31/2020
Legislative Date
1/31/2020
Action
Hearing 2/18 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/11/2020
Legislative Date
2/11/2020
Action
Hearing canceled
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/11/2020
Legislative Date
2/11/2020
Action
Hearing 2/27 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 1/31/2020 1/31/2020 First Reading Appropriations
Text - First - Correctional Officers' Retirement System - Membership
House 1/31/2020 1/31/2020 Hearing 2/18 at 1:00 p.m.
House 2/11/2020 2/11/2020 Hearing canceled
House 2/11/2020 2/11/2020 Hearing 2/27 at 1:00 p.m.
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
Last Updated: 2/28/2020 12:32 PM