Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Conserving Working Waterfront Farms Act of 2017
Sponsored by
Delegates Mautz, Adams, Lafferty, McComas, Robinson, and Stein
Status
In the House - Unfavorable Report by Environment and Transportation
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Altering the contents of the criteria developed by the Maryland Agricultural Land Preservation Foundation for counties to consider when determining whether a property qualifies for the Critical Farms Program to include other benefits attributable to wildlife habitat enhancement and shoreline and water quality protection; and requiring the State Department of Agriculture to report to specified committees of the General Assembly on or before December 1, 2017, on its efforts to encourage easement purchases on working waterfront farms.
Committees
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0719
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): June 1, 2017
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/03/2017
Legislative Date
2/03/2017
Action
First Reading Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Conserving Working Waterfront Farms Act of 2017
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/08/2017
Legislative Date
2/08/2017
Action
Hearing 2/22 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/14/2017
Legislative Date
3/14/2017
Action
Unfavorable Report by Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/03/2017 2/03/2017 First Reading Environment and Transportation
Text - First - Conserving Working Waterfront Farms Act of 2017
House 2/08/2017 2/08/2017 Hearing 2/22 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Environment and Transportation
House 3/14/2017 3/14/2017 Unfavorable Report by Environment and Transportation
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   2-517 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:31 PM