Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
State Employees Pension Choice Act
Sponsored by
Delegates Aumann, Afzali, Bates, Boteler, Cluster, Eckardt, Fisher, Frank, George, Haddaway-Riccio, Hershey, Hogan, Hough, Impallaria, Jacobs, Kipke, Krebs, McComas, McDermott, McDonough, McMillan, Minnick, Myers, Norman, O'Donnell, Otto, Parrott, Ready, Schuh, Schulz, Serafini, Smigiel, Stocksdale, Szeliga, Vitale, and Weir
Status
In the House - Unfavorable Report by Appropriations
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Providing that specified employees are not members of the Employees' Pension System or the Teachers' Pension System of the State Retirement and Pension System if the employees make an election to join the optional retirement program of the State Retirement and Pension System; requiring that specified participating employers provide specified employees with the opportunity to participate in the optional retirement program; etc.
Committees
Original:
Appropriations  
Opposite:
Details
Introduced in a prior session as: HB0843 Session: 2011 Regular Session
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2013
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/05/2013
Legislative Date
2/06/2013
Action
First Reading Appropriations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/20/2013
Legislative Date
2/20/2013
Action
Hearing 3/07 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/19/2013
Legislative Date
3/20/2013
Action
Unfavorable Report by Appropriations
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/05/2013 2/06/2013 First Reading Appropriations
House 2/20/2013 2/20/2013 Hearing 3/07 at 1:00 p.m.
House 3/19/2013 3/20/2013 Unfavorable Report by Appropriations
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   23-201, 30-101, 30-201, 30-202, 30-207, 30-210, 30-301, 30-302, 30-303, 30-305, 30-307 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:27 PM