Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Task Force on the Prevention of Child Abuse and Neglect
Sponsored by
Delegates McComas, Arentz, Carozza, Cassilly, Chang, Kittleman, Krebs, Lam, Mautz, McConkey, McMillan, Metzgar, Miele, Platt, B. Robinson, S. Robinson, Shoemaker, Szeliga, Vogt, and B. Wilson
Status
In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Establishing the Task Force on the Prevention of Child Abuse and Neglect; providing for the composition, chair, and staffing of the Task Force; requiring the Task Force to study and make recommendations regarding specified matters; requiring the Task Force to report to the Governor and the General Assembly on or before December 1, 2015; providing for the termination of the Act; etc.
Committees
Original:
Judiciary  
Opposite:
Judicial Proceedings  
Details
Introduced in a prior session as: HB1389 Session: 2014 Regular Session
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): June 1, 2015
Creates a Task Force or Commission
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/12/2015
Legislative Date
2/13/2015
Action
First Reading Judiciary
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/13/2015
Legislative Date
2/13/2015
Action
Hearing 3/19 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/20/2015
Legislative Date
3/20/2015
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Judiciary
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/20/2015
Legislative Date
3/19/2015
Action
Favorable with Amendments {302516/1 Report Adopted
Proceedings
49
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/20/2015
Legislative Date
3/19/2015
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
49
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/23/2015
Legislative Date
3/21/2015
Action
Third Reading Passed (137-1)
Proceedings
51
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/23/2015
Legislative Date
3/20/2015
Action
First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
47A
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/24/2015
Legislative Date
3/24/2015
Action
Hearing 3/31 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/09/2015
Legislative Date
4/10/2015
Action
Unfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/12/2015 2/13/2015 First Reading Judiciary
House 2/13/2015 2/13/2015 Hearing 3/19 at 1:00 p.m.
House 3/20/2015 3/20/2015 Favorable with Amendments Report by Judiciary
House 3/20/2015 3/19/2015 Favorable with Amendments {302516/1 Report Adopted 49
House 3/20/2015 3/19/2015 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 49
House 3/23/2015 3/21/2015 Third Reading Passed (137-1) 51
Senate 3/23/2015 3/20/2015 First Reading Judicial Proceedings 47A
Senate 3/24/2015 3/24/2015 Hearing 3/31 at 1:00 p.m.
Senate 4/09/2015 4/10/2015 Unfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:29 PM