Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Real Property - Residential Leases - Interest on Security Deposits
Sponsored by
Delegates McMillan, Beidle, Cassilly, Frush, Healey, O'Donnell, S. Robinson, Stein, and Vitale
Status
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 455
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Attorney General's Review Letter
Synopsis
Altering the calculation of the interest rate paid on a security deposit under a residential lease or a mobile home park rental agreement; altering the requirements for a customized calculator that the Department of Housing and Community Development is required to maintain on its Web site; applying the Act to any interest accruing on a security deposit under a residential lease or mobile home park rental agreement on or after January 1, 2015; etc.
Committees
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0408
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): June 1, 2015
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/12/2015
Legislative Date
2/13/2015
Action
First Reading Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/13/2015
Legislative Date
2/13/2015
Action
Hearing 3/03 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/14/2015
Legislative Date
3/16/2015
Action
Favorable Report by Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/18/2015
Legislative Date
3/15/2015
Action
Favorable Report Adopted
Proceedings
45A
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/18/2015
Legislative Date
3/15/2015
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
45A
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/19/2015
Legislative Date
3/17/2015
Action
Third Reading Passed (137-1)
Proceedings
47
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/20/2015
Legislative Date
3/20/2015
Action
First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
47
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/01/2015
Legislative Date
4/02/2015
Action
Favorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/02/2015
Legislative Date
3/28/2015
Action
Favorable Report Adopted
Proceedings
55
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/02/2015
Legislative Date
3/28/2015
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
55
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/03/2015
Legislative Date
3/29/2015
Action
Third Reading Passed (47-0)
Proceedings
56
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/06/2015
Legislative Date
3/31/2015
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
61
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
5/12/2015
Legislative Date
5/12/2015
Action
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 455
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/12/2015 2/13/2015 First Reading Environment and Transportation
House 2/13/2015 2/13/2015 Hearing 3/03 at 1:00 p.m.
House 3/14/2015 3/16/2015 Favorable Report by Environment and Transportation
House 3/18/2015 3/15/2015 Favorable Report Adopted 45A
House 3/18/2015 3/15/2015 Second Reading Passed 45A
House 3/19/2015 3/17/2015 Third Reading Passed (137-1) 47
Senate 3/20/2015 3/20/2015 First Reading Judicial Proceedings 47
Senate 4/01/2015 4/02/2015 Favorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
Senate 4/02/2015 3/28/2015 Favorable Report Adopted 55
Senate 4/02/2015 3/28/2015 Second Reading Passed 55
Senate 4/03/2015 3/29/2015 Third Reading Passed (47-0) 56
House 4/06/2015 3/31/2015 Returned Passed 61
Post Passage 5/12/2015 5/12/2015 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 455
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   8-203, 8A-1001 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:29 PM