Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Consumer Protection - Credit Report Security Freezes - Prohibition on Fees and Required Notices
Sponsored by
Delegates Waldstreicher, Barkley, Carr, Clippinger, Glenn, Hill, Kramer, Lisanti, McCray, A. Miller, Rosenberg, Sanchez, Stein, Sydnor, Valderrama, Vaughn, and C. Wilson
Status
In the Senate - Hearing cancelled
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Prohibiting a consumer reporting agency from charging a consumer a fee for placing a security freeze or for the first two temporary lifts of a security freeze in a calendar year if the consumer has received a notice of a breach of the security of a system under specified provisions of State or federal law, and provides a copy of the notice to the consumer reporting agency; etc.
Committees
Original:
Economic Matters  
Opposite:
Finance
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0665
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2016
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/05/2016
Legislative Date
2/08/2016
Action
First Reading Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/08/2016
Legislative Date
2/08/2016
Action
Hearing 2/24 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/14/2016
Legislative Date
3/14/2016
Action
Favorable Report by Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/15/2016
Legislative Date
3/12/2016
Action
Favorable Report Adopted
Proceedings
44
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/15/2016
Legislative Date
3/12/2016
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
44
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/16/2016
Legislative Date
3/13/2016
Action
Third Reading Passed (105-34)
Proceedings
45
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/17/2016
Legislative Date
3/17/2016
Action
First Reading Finance
Proceedings
46
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/17/2016
Legislative Date
3/17/2016
Action
Hearing 3/30 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/23/2016
Legislative Date
3/23/2016
Action
Hearing cancelled
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/05/2016 2/08/2016 First Reading Economic Matters
House 2/08/2016 2/08/2016 Hearing 2/24 at 1:00 p.m.
House 3/14/2016 3/14/2016 Favorable Report by Economic Matters
House 3/15/2016 3/12/2016 Favorable Report Adopted 44
House 3/15/2016 3/12/2016 Second Reading Passed 44
House 3/16/2016 3/13/2016 Third Reading Passed (105-34) 45
Senate 3/17/2016 3/17/2016 First Reading Finance 46
Senate 3/17/2016 3/17/2016 Hearing 3/30 at 1:00 p.m.
Senate 3/23/2016 3/23/2016 Hearing cancelled
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   14-1212.1, 14-3504 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:29 PM