Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Maryland Achieving a Better Life Experience (ABLE) Program – Modifications
Sponsored by
Delegates Waldstreicher, Bromwell, Angel, Cullison, Hayes, Hill, Kelly, Kipke, Krebs, Metzgar, Miele, Morales, Morgan, Pena-Melnyk, Pendergrass, Platt, Rosenberg, Saab, Sample-Hughes, Szeliga, West, and K. Young
Status
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 390
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Providing that certain money in the Maryland Prepaid College Trust may not be considered money of or be commingled with the Maryland Broker-Dealer College Investment Plan or the Maryland ABLE Program; requiring the Maryland 529 Board to allow the transfer of funds from certain trusts and plans to any qualified ABLE program; altering the limit on money and assets that a certain account holder can contribute to an ABLE account during a certain period of time; etc.
Committees
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0550
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): June 1, 2018
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/01/2018
Legislative Date
2/01/2018
Action
First Reading Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/07/2018
Legislative Date
2/07/2018
Action
Hearing 2/21 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/12/2018
Legislative Date
3/12/2018
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/13/2018
Legislative Date
3/10/2018
Action
Favorable with Amendments {836283/1 Adopted
Proceedings
44
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/13/2018
Legislative Date
3/10/2018
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
44
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/15/2018
Legislative Date
3/12/2018
Action
Third Reading Passed (137-0)
Proceedings
46
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/16/2018
Legislative Date
3/16/2018
Action
Referred Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
48
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/19/2018
Legislative Date
3/19/2018
Action
Hearing 3/27 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/28/2018
Legislative Date
3/28/2018
Action
Favorable Report by Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/28/2018
Legislative Date
3/24/2018
Action
Favorable Adopted
Proceedings
55
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/28/2018
Legislative Date
3/24/2018
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
55
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/29/2018
Legislative Date
3/26/2018
Action
Third Reading Passed (44-0)
Proceedings
57
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/30/2018
Legislative Date
3/23/2018
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
57
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
5/08/2018
Legislative Date
5/08/2018
Action
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 390
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/01/2018 2/01/2018 First Reading Health and Government Operations
Text - First - Maryland Achieving a Better Life Experience (ABLE) Program – Death of a Designated Beneficiary
House 2/07/2018 2/07/2018 Hearing 2/21 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Health and Government Operations
House 3/12/2018 3/12/2018 Favorable with Amendments Report by Health and Government Operations
House 3/13/2018 3/10/2018 Favorable with Amendments {836283/1 Adopted 44
House 3/13/2018 3/10/2018 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 44
Text - Third - Maryland Achieving a Better Life Experience (ABLE) Program – Modifications
House 3/15/2018 3/12/2018 Third Reading Passed (137-0) 46
Senate 3/16/2018 3/16/2018 Referred Budget and Taxation 48
Senate 3/19/2018 3/19/2018 Hearing 3/27 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - Senate - Committee - Budget and Taxation
Senate 3/28/2018 3/28/2018 Favorable Report by Budget and Taxation
Senate 3/28/2018 3/24/2018 Favorable Adopted 55
Senate 3/28/2018 3/24/2018 Second Reading Passed 55
Senate 3/29/2018 3/26/2018 Third Reading Passed (44-0) 57
House 3/30/2018 3/23/2018 Returned Passed 57
Post Passage 5/08/2018 5/08/2018 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 390
Text - Chapter - Maryland Achieving a Better Life Experience (ABLE) Program – Modifications
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   18-1903, 18-1905.1, 18-1909, 18-19A-01, 18-19A-02, 18-19B-01, 18-19B-02, 18-19C-01, 18-19C-02, 18-19C-03, 18-19C-09, 18-19C-10 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:30 PM