Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
State Board of Pharmacy - Jurisdiction over Dentists Who Prepare and Dispense Dental Products and Antibiotics
Sponsored by
Delegates Reznik, Barkley, McComas, and B. Robinson
Status
In the House - Withdrawn by Sponsor
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Altering the jurisdiction of the State Board of Pharmacy to exclude licensed dentists who personally prepare and dispense specified prescription strength dental products and specified antibiotics to patients receiving dental care pro bono under specified circumstances; and requiring specified dentists to enter an appropriate record on a patient's chart under specified circumstances.
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2013
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/05/2013
Legislative Date
2/06/2013
Action
First Reading Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/13/2013
Legislative Date
2/13/2013
Action
Hearing 2/28 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/15/2013
Legislative Date
2/15/2013
Action
Hearing cancelled
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/15/2013
Legislative Date
2/15/2013
Action
Hearing 3/07 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/27/2013
Legislative Date
3/28/2013
Action
Unfavorable Report by Health and Government Operations; Withdrawn
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/05/2013 2/06/2013 First Reading Health and Government Operations
House 2/13/2013 2/13/2013 Hearing 2/28 at 1:00 p.m.
House 2/15/2013 2/15/2013 Hearing cancelled
House 2/15/2013 2/15/2013 Hearing 3/07 at 1:00 p.m.
House 3/27/2013 3/28/2013 Unfavorable Report by Health and Government Operations; Withdrawn
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:27 PM
Click to return on the top page