Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Consumer Protection - Collection and Sale of Consumer Debt - Restrictions
Sponsored by
Delegates Gutierrez, Carr, Cullison, Luedtke, Moon, Morales, Pena-Melnyk, and Smith
Status
In the House - Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Prohibiting a debt collector from attempting to collect a debt unless the debt collector possesses specified verifiable information; requiring a specified affidavit to meet specified requirements; prohibiting supporting documents in a civil action, including affidavits, from being created solely for the purpose of filing a civil action; prohibiting an original creditor from selling a specified debt; requiring an original creditor to provide specified documentation to a debt buyer; etc.
Committees
Original:
Economic Matters  
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2016
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/05/2016
Legislative Date
2/08/2016
Action
First Reading Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/08/2016
Legislative Date
2/08/2016
Action
Hearing 2/24 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/11/2016
Legislative Date
2/11/2016
Action
Hearing cancelled
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/11/2016
Legislative Date
2/11/2016
Action
Hearing 3/02 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/18/2016
Legislative Date
3/19/2016
Action
Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/05/2016 2/08/2016 First Reading Economic Matters
House 2/08/2016 2/08/2016 Hearing 2/24 at 1:00 p.m.
House 2/11/2016 2/11/2016 Hearing cancelled
House 2/11/2016 2/11/2016 Hearing 3/02 at 1:00 p.m.
House 3/18/2016 3/19/2016 Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   14-201, 14-202 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:29 PM