Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Vehicle Equipment - Driver Alcohol Detection System for Safety Program
Sponsored by
Delegates Kramer and Fraser-Hidalgo
Status
In the House - Unfavorable Report by Judiciary
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Requiring each motor vehicles registered in the State and manufactured after January 1, 2022, to be equipped with specified driver alcohol detection equipment relating to the federal Driver Alcohol Detection System for Safety program; prohibiting a person from tampering with, or otherwise attempting to circumvent, specified equipment installed on specified motor vehicles; and providing for a maximum penalty of $500 or imprisonment for not more than 2 months or both.
Committees
Original:
Judiciary  
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2017
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/03/2017
Legislative Date
2/03/2017
Action
First Reading Judiciary
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Vehicle Equipment - Driver Alcohol Detection System for Safety Program
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/08/2017
Legislative Date
2/08/2017
Action
Hearing 3/01 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Judiciary
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/13/2017
Legislative Date
3/13/2017
Action
Unfavorable Report by Judiciary
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/03/2017 2/03/2017 First Reading Judiciary
Text - First - Vehicle Equipment - Driver Alcohol Detection System for Safety Program
House 2/08/2017 2/08/2017 Hearing 3/01 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Judiciary
House 3/13/2017 3/13/2017 Unfavorable Report by Judiciary
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   22-420 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:31 PM