Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Income Tax Credit - Emergency Backup Generators
Sponsored by
Delegates A. Miller, Barkley, Elliott, and Cardin
Status
In the Senate - Hearing 3/25 at 1:00 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Allowing a qualified nursing home to claim a refundable credit against the State income tax in the amount of sales and use tax paid for the purchase of a backup generator; and providing that the Act be applicable to all taxable years beginning after December 31, 2013, but before January 1, 2019.
Committees
Original:
Ways and Means  
Opposite:
Budget and Taxation  
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0732
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2014
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/31/2014
Legislative Date
2/03/2014
Action
First Reading Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/06/2014
Legislative Date
2/06/2014
Action
Hearing 2/25 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/13/2014
Legislative Date
3/14/2014
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/14/2014
Legislative Date
3/11/2014
Action
Favorable with Amendments {115266/1 Report Adopted
Proceedings
47
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/14/2014
Legislative Date
3/11/2014
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
47
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/15/2014
Legislative Date
3/12/2014
Action
Third Reading Passed (128-1)
Proceedings
48A
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/18/2014
Legislative Date
3/13/2014
Action
First Reading Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
47
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/19/2014
Legislative Date
3/19/2014
Action
Hearing 3/25 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 1/31/2014 2/03/2014 First Reading Ways and Means
House 2/06/2014 2/06/2014 Hearing 2/25 at 1:00 p.m.
House 3/13/2014 3/14/2014 Favorable with Amendments Report by Ways and Means
House 3/14/2014 3/11/2014 Favorable with Amendments {115266/1 Report Adopted 47
House 3/14/2014 3/11/2014 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 47
House 3/15/2014 3/12/2014 Third Reading Passed (128-1) 48A
Senate 3/18/2014 3/13/2014 First Reading Budget and Taxation 47
Senate 3/19/2014 3/19/2014 Hearing 3/25 at 1:00 p.m.
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   10-736 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:29 PM