Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Harford Community College - Requirements to Propose Tuition Increase
Sponsored by
Delegate McDonough
Status
In the House - Hearing cancelled
Analysis
Synopsis
Requiring the President of Harford Community College to take specified actions before proposing an increase in tuition at Harford Community College; requiring two public meetings to be held; requiring a report to be published on the College's Web site that provides specified information regarding the proposed tuition increase; and requiring specified actions to occur before the Board of Trustees of Harford Community College votes on a budget that includes a tuition increase.
Committees
Original:
Ways and Means
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2015
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/12/2015
Legislative Date
2/13/2015
Action
First Reading Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/18/2015
Legislative Date
2/18/2015
Action
Hearing 3/05 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/20/2015
Legislative Date
2/20/2015
Action
Hearing cancelled
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/20/2015
Legislative Date
2/20/2015
Action
Hearing 3/13 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/20/2015
Legislative Date
2/20/2015
Action
Hearing cancelled
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/20/2015
Legislative Date
2/20/2015
Action
Hearing 3/19 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/12/2015
Legislative Date
3/12/2015
Action
Hearing cancelled
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/12/2015 2/13/2015 First Reading Ways and Means
House 2/18/2015 2/18/2015 Hearing 3/05 at 1:00 p.m.
House 2/20/2015 2/20/2015 Hearing cancelled
House 2/20/2015 2/20/2015 Hearing 3/13 at 1:00 p.m.
House 2/20/2015 2/20/2015 Hearing cancelled
House 2/20/2015 2/20/2015 Hearing 3/19 at 1:00 p.m.
House 3/12/2015 3/12/2015 Hearing cancelled
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   16-408.1 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:29 PM