Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Drones - Unauthorized Surveillance
Sponsored by
Delegates George, Afzali, Jameson, Kipke, McComas, McMillan, Rosenberg, Stocksdale, Szeliga, Vitale, and Wilson
Status
In the House - Unfavorable Report by Judiciary
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Prohibiting a law enforcement agency from using a drone to gather evidence or other information without a warrant except under specified circumstances; authorizing an aggrieved party to initiate a specified civil action against a law enforcement agency; establishing that evidence obtained or collected in violation of the Act is not admissible as evidence in a criminal prosecution in a court of law in the State; etc.
Committees
Original:
Judiciary  
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2014
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/31/2014
Legislative Date
2/03/2014
Action
First Reading Judiciary
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/07/2014
Legislative Date
2/07/2014
Action
Hearing 3/06 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/12/2014
Legislative Date
3/13/2014
Action
Unfavorable Report by Judiciary
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 1/31/2014 2/03/2014 First Reading Judiciary
House 2/07/2014 2/07/2014 Hearing 3/06 at 1:00 p.m.
House 3/12/2014 3/13/2014 Unfavorable Report by Judiciary
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:29 PM