Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Health Insurance and Pharmacy Benefits Managers - Freedom of Choice of Pharmacy Act
Sponsored by
Delegates Morgan, Kipke, and Krebs
Status
In the House - Unfavorable Report by Health and Government Operations; Withdrawn
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Prohibiting pharmacy benefits managers from requiring a beneficiary to use a mail-order pharmacy to fill or refill a prescription as a condition for reimbursing the cost of the drug; prohibiting certain carriers from prohibiting an enrollee from selecting, or limiting the ability of an enrollee to select, a pharmacy of the enrollee's choice for the receipt of pharmacy services; etc.
Committees
Committee Testimony
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): January 1, 2021
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/03/2020
Legislative Date
2/03/2020
Action
First Reading Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/06/2020
Legislative Date
2/06/2020
Action
Hearing 2/27 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/27/2020
Legislative Date
2/27/2020
Action
Hearing canceled
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/03/2020
Legislative Date
3/03/2020
Action
Unfavorable Report by Health and Government Operations; Withdrawn
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/03/2020 2/03/2020 First Reading Health and Government Operations
Text - First - Health Insurance and Pharmacy Benefits Managers - Freedom of Choice of Pharmacy Act
House 2/06/2020 2/06/2020 Hearing 2/27 at 1:00 p.m.
House 2/27/2020 2/27/2020 Hearing canceled
Vote - House - Committee - Health and Government Operations
House 3/03/2020 3/03/2020 Unfavorable Report by Health and Government Operations; Withdrawn
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   15-1611.1, 15-2001 through 15-2005, 15-805, 15-806, 15-847 )
Last Updated: 9/22/2020 2:05 PM