Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Health Insurance and Pharmacy Benefits Managers - Freedom of Choice of Pharmacy Act
Sponsored by
Delegates Morgan, Kipke, and Krebs
Status
In the House - Withdrawn by Sponsor
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Prohibiting pharmacy benefits managers from requiring a beneficiary to use a mail-order pharmacy to fill or refill a prescription as a condition for reimbursing the cost of the drug; prohibiting certain carriers from prohibiting an enrollee from selecting, or limiting the ability of an enrollee to select, a pharmacy of the enrollee's choice for the receipt of pharmacy services; etc.
Committees
Committee Testimony
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): January 1, 2021
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/03/2020
Legislative Date
2/03/2020
Action
First Reading Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/06/2020
Legislative Date
2/06/2020
Action
Hearing 2/27 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/27/2020
Legislative Date
2/27/2020
Action
Hearing canceled
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/03/2020
Legislative Date
3/03/2020
Action
Withdrawn by Sponsor
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/03/2020 2/03/2020 First Reading Health and Government Operations
Text - First - Health Insurance and Pharmacy Benefits Managers - Freedom of Choice of Pharmacy Act
House 2/06/2020 2/06/2020 Hearing 2/27 at 1:00 p.m.
House 2/27/2020 2/27/2020 Hearing canceled
Vote - House - Committee - Health and Government Operations Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/03/2020 3/03/2020 Withdrawn by Sponsor
(   15-1611.1, 15-2001 through 15-2005, 15-805, 15-806, 15-847 )
Last Updated: 9/22/2020 2:05 PM
Click to return on the top page