Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Department of Human Services, Maryland Department of Health, and Department of Education - Easing Access to Family Support Programs
Sponsored by
Delegate Kaiser
Status
In the House - Hearing 2/10 at 1:30 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Establishing that it is the policy of the State to do everything possible to alleviate administrative hurdles for low-income families seeking access to support programs; requiring that the Department of Human Services, the Maryland Department of Health, and the State Department of Education to take certain steps to achieve the policy goal and to simplify the application process for family support programs; requiring a joint progress report be submitted by January 1, 2023 and include areas where legislative changes are needed; etc.
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2021
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/29/2021
Legislative Date
1/29/2021
Action
First Reading Appropriations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/01/2021
Legislative Date
2/01/2021
Action
Hearing 2/10 at 1:30 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 1/29/2021 1/29/2021 First Reading Appropriations
Text - First - Department of Human Services, Maryland Department of Health, and Department of Education - Easing Access to Family Support Programs
House 2/01/2021 2/01/2021 Hearing 2/10 at 1:30 p.m.
Statutes
Last Updated: 2/12/2021 2:58 PM
Click to return on the top page