Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Juvenile Law - Task Force on Juvenile Court Jurisdiction
Sponsored by
Delegates Carter, Anderson, Braveboy, and M. Washington
Status
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 639
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Establishing the Task Force on Juvenile Court Jurisdiction; establishing the duties of the Task Force; requiring the Task Force to study issues including whether to eliminate the existing exclusionary offenses that automatically result in adult charges for youth and restore juvenile court discretion; requiring the Task Force to report its findings to the Governor and General Assembly on or before December 1, 2013; etc.
Committees
Original:
Judiciary  
Opposite:
Judicial Proceedings  
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): June 1, 2013
Creates a Task Force or Commission
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/05/2013
Legislative Date
2/06/2013
Action
First Reading Judiciary
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/07/2013
Legislative Date
2/07/2013
Action
Hearing 3/07 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/22/2013
Legislative Date
3/23/2013
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Judiciary
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/23/2013
Legislative Date
3/20/2013
Action
Favorable with Amendments {622418/1 Report Adopted
Proceedings
53A
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/23/2013
Legislative Date
3/20/2013
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
53A
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/25/2013
Legislative Date
3/21/2013
Action
Third Reading Passed (128-8)
Proceedings
54
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/25/2013
Legislative Date
3/21/2013
Action
First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
52
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/26/2013
Legislative Date
3/26/2013
Action
Hearing 4/02 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/03/2013
Legislative Date
4/04/2013
Action
Favorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/05/2013
Legislative Date
4/01/2013
Action
Favorable Report Adopted
Proceedings
63
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/05/2013
Legislative Date
4/01/2013
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
63
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/08/2013
Legislative Date
4/02/2013
Action
Third Reading Passed (45-2)
Proceedings
64
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/08/2013
Legislative Date
4/03/2013
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
67
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
5/16/2013
Legislative Date
5/16/2013
Action
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 639
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/05/2013 2/06/2013 First Reading Judiciary
House 2/07/2013 2/07/2013 Hearing 3/07 at 1:00 p.m.
House 3/22/2013 3/23/2013 Favorable with Amendments Report by Judiciary
House 3/23/2013 3/20/2013 Favorable with Amendments {622418/1 Report Adopted 53A
House 3/23/2013 3/20/2013 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 53A
House 3/25/2013 3/21/2013 Third Reading Passed (128-8) 54
Senate 3/25/2013 3/21/2013 First Reading Judicial Proceedings 52
Senate 3/26/2013 3/26/2013 Hearing 4/02 at 1:00 p.m.
Senate 4/03/2013 4/04/2013 Favorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
Senate 4/05/2013 4/01/2013 Favorable Report Adopted 63
Senate 4/05/2013 4/01/2013 Second Reading Passed 63
Senate 4/08/2013 4/02/2013 Third Reading Passed (45-2) 64
House 4/08/2013 4/03/2013 Returned Passed 67
Post Passage 5/16/2013 5/16/2013 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 639
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:27 PM