Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Public Safety – Rifles and Shotguns – Secondary Transactions
Sponsored by
Delegates Atterbeary, Acevero, B. Barnes, Bartlett, Barve, Branch, Bridges, Cain, Carr, Chang, Charkoudian, Charles, Crutchfield, Cullison, D.M. Davis, D.E. Davis, Dumais, Ebersole, Feldmark, Fennell, W. Fisher, Fraser-Hidalgo, Gilchrist, Glenn, Healey, Hettleman, Hill, Ivey, Jalisi, Jones, Kaiser, Kelly, Korman, Krimm, Lafferty, J. Lewis, R. Lewis, Lierman, Lopez, Love, McIntosh, Moon, Mosby, Palakovich Carr, Patterson, Pendergrass, Proctor, Qi, Reznik, Rogers, Sample-Hughes, Shetty, Smith, Solomon, Sydnor, Terrasa, Turner, Valentino-Smith, C. Watson, R. Watson, K. Young, and P. Young
Status
In the House - Conference Committee Appointed
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Providing that a person who is not a certain licensee may not complete the transfer of a certain rifle or shotgun as transferor or transferee, except under certain circumstances; requiring, before a certain transfer is conducted, the transferor and transferee to meet jointly with a certain licensee and request that the licensee facilitate the transfer; requiring a licensee to take certain actions when facilitating a transfer; etc.
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0737
Introduced in a prior session as: HB1448 Session: 2017 Regular Session
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2019
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/08/2019
Legislative Date
2/08/2019
Action
First Reading Judiciary
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/08/2019
Legislative Date
2/08/2019
Action
Hearing 2/25 at 10:00 a.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Public Safety - Rifles and Shotguns - Transactions
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Judiciary
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/15/2019
Legislative Date
3/15/2019
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Judiciary
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/15/2019
Legislative Date
3/12/2019
Action
Favorable with Amendments {832918/1 Adopted
Proceedings
47 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/15/2019
Legislative Date
3/12/2019
Action
Motion Special Order until 03/16 (Delegate Kipke) Adopted
Proceedings
47 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/16/2019
Legislative Date
3/13/2019
Action
Motion Special Order until Later This Session (Delegate Kipke) Adopted
Proceedings
48 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/16/2019
Legislative Date
3/13/2019
Action
Floor Amendment {603226/1 (Delegate Szeliga) Adopted
Proceedings
48 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/16/2019
Legislative Date
3/13/2019
Action
Floor Amendment {723222/1 (Delegate Mautz) Adopted
Proceedings
48 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/16/2019
Legislative Date
3/13/2019
Action
Floor Amendment {893821/1 (Delegate Mautz) Rejected (44-88)
Proceedings
48 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/16/2019
Legislative Date
3/13/2019
Action
Floor Amendment {513723/1 (Delegate Hornberger) Rejected (38-91)
Proceedings
48 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/16/2019
Legislative Date
3/13/2019
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
48 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Third - Public Safety – Rifles and Shotguns – Secondary Transactions
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/18/2019
Legislative Date
3/14/2019
Action
Third Reading Passed (90-49)
Proceedings
49 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/18/2019
Legislative Date
3/16/2019
Action
Referred Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
48 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/05/2019
Legislative Date
4/05/2019
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/05/2019
Legislative Date
3/30/2019
Action
Favorable with Amendments {708570/1
Proceedings
62 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/05/2019
Legislative Date
3/30/2019
Action
Motion Special Order until Later Today (Senator Zirkin) Adopted
Proceedings
62 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/05/2019
Legislative Date
3/30/2019
Action
Favorable with Amendments {708570/1 Adopted
Proceedings
62AClick to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/05/2019
Legislative Date
3/30/2019
Action
Floor Amendment {713624/2 (Senator Zirkin) Adopted
Proceedings
62AClick to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/05/2019
Legislative Date
3/30/2019
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
62AClick to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/08/2019
Legislative Date
3/31/2019
Action
Third Reading Passed (32-14)
Proceedings
63 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/08/2019
Legislative Date
4/02/2019
Action
House Refuses Concur Senate Amendments
Proceedings
68 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/08/2019
Legislative Date
4/02/2019
Action
House Requests Senate Recede
Proceedings
68 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/08/2019
Legislative Date
4/02/2019
Action
House Conference Committee Appointed (Delegates Clippinger, Lopez and Moon)
Proceedings
68 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/08/2019 2/08/2019 First Reading Judiciary
House 2/08/2019 2/08/2019 Hearing 2/25 at 10:00 a.m.
Text - First - Public Safety - Rifles and Shotguns - Transactions
Vote - House - Committee - Judiciary Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/15/2019 3/15/2019 Favorable with Amendments Report by Judiciary
House 3/15/2019 3/12/2019 Favorable with Amendments {832918/1 Adopted 47 Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/15/2019 3/12/2019 Motion Special Order until 03/16 (Delegate Kipke) Adopted 47 Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/16/2019 3/13/2019 Motion Special Order until Later This Session (Delegate Kipke) Adopted 48 Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/16/2019 3/13/2019 Floor Amendment {603226/1 (Delegate Szeliga) Adopted 48 Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/16/2019 3/13/2019 Floor Amendment {723222/1 (Delegate Mautz) Adopted 48 Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/16/2019 3/13/2019 Floor Amendment {893821/1 (Delegate Mautz) Rejected (44-88) 48 Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/16/2019 3/13/2019 Floor Amendment {513723/1 (Delegate Hornberger) Rejected (38-91) 48 Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/16/2019 3/13/2019 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 48 Click to view Recorded Media
Text - Third - Public Safety – Rifles and Shotguns – Secondary Transactions
House 3/18/2019 3/14/2019 Third Reading Passed (90-49) 49 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/18/2019 3/16/2019 Referred Judicial Proceedings 48 Click to view Recorded Media
Vote - Senate - Committee - Judicial Proceedings Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/05/2019 4/05/2019 Favorable with Amendments Report by Judicial Proceedings
Senate 4/05/2019 3/30/2019 Favorable with Amendments {708570/1 62 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/05/2019 3/30/2019 Motion Special Order until Later Today (Senator Zirkin) Adopted 62 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/05/2019 3/30/2019 Favorable with Amendments {708570/1 Adopted 62AClick to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/05/2019 3/30/2019 Floor Amendment {713624/2 (Senator Zirkin) Adopted 62AClick to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/05/2019 3/30/2019 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 62AClick to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/08/2019 3/31/2019 Third Reading Passed (32-14) 63 Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/08/2019 4/02/2019 House Refuses Concur Senate Amendments 68 Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/08/2019 4/02/2019 House Requests Senate Recede 68 Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/08/2019 4/02/2019 House Conference Committee Appointed (Delegates Clippinger, Lopez and Moon) 68 Click to view Recorded Media
(   5-201, 5-204.1 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:31 PM
Click to return on the top page