Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Criminal Law - Reckless Endangerment - Repeal of Specific Charging Requirement
Sponsored by
Delegate Simmons
Status
In the Senate - First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Repealing the requirement that a defendant must be charged specifically with reckless endangerment to be found guilty of reckless endangerment.
Committees
Original:
Judiciary  
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2013
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/05/2013
Legislative Date
2/06/2013
Action
First Reading Judiciary
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/06/2013
Legislative Date
2/06/2013
Action
Hearing 2/26 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/14/2013
Legislative Date
3/18/2013
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Judiciary
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/19/2013
Legislative Date
3/16/2013
Action
Favorable with Amendments {262913/1 Report Adopted
Proceedings
49
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/19/2013
Legislative Date
3/16/2013
Action
Special Order until 3/20 (Delegate McDonough) Adopted
Proceedings
49
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/20/2013
Legislative Date
3/17/2013
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
50
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/25/2013
Legislative Date
3/21/2013
Action
Third Reading Passed (77-57)
Proceedings
54
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/25/2013
Legislative Date
3/21/2013
Action
First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
52
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/05/2013 2/06/2013 First Reading Judiciary
House 2/06/2013 2/06/2013 Hearing 2/26 at 1:00 p.m.
House 3/14/2013 3/18/2013 Favorable with Amendments Report by Judiciary
House 3/19/2013 3/16/2013 Favorable with Amendments {262913/1 Report Adopted 49
House 3/19/2013 3/16/2013 Special Order until 3/20 (Delegate McDonough) Adopted 49
House 3/20/2013 3/17/2013 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 50
House 3/25/2013 3/21/2013 Third Reading Passed (77-57) 54
Senate 3/25/2013 3/21/2013 First Reading Judicial Proceedings 52
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   3-206 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:27 PM