Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Dedicated State Funds Protection Act
Sponsored by
Delegates McMillan, Fisher, Kramer, Sophocleus, and Szeliga
Status
In the House - Unfavorable Report by Appropriations
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Proposing an amendment to the Maryland Constitution prohibiting specified transfers of dedicated State funds to the General Fund except for specified purposes under specified circumstances; requiring the Governor to include provisions in the budget that provide for the repayment of dedicated State funds under specified circumstances within 5 years of the transfer or diversion; and submitting the amendment to the qualified voters of the State for their adoption or rejection.
Committees
Original:
Appropriations  
Details
Constitutional Bill
Introduced in a prior session as: HB0754 Session: 2014 Regular Session
Bill File Type: Regular
Contingency - on a referendum
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/12/2015
Legislative Date
2/13/2015
Action
First Reading Appropriations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/18/2015
Legislative Date
2/18/2015
Action
Hearing 2/24 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/27/2015
Legislative Date
3/02/2015
Action
Unfavorable Report by Appropriations
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/12/2015 2/13/2015 First Reading Appropriations
House 2/18/2015 2/18/2015 Hearing 2/24 at 1:00 p.m.
House 2/27/2015 3/02/2015 Unfavorable Report by Appropriations
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:29 PM