Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Electricity - Energy Storage Systems (Storage Technology and Electric Power (STEP) Act)
Sponsored by
Delegates Korman, Barkley, Carr, Cassilly, Fraser-Hidalgo, Frick, Frush, Hixson, Krimm, Lam, Lierman, Luedtke, Miele, A. Miller, Morhaim, Reznik, and Waldstreicher
Status
In the House - Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters; Withdrawn
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Requiring the Public Service Commission to open a proceeding to determine appropriate targets and policies for specified electric companies to procure energy storage systems by January 1, 2021, and January 1, 2026; providing for the consideration of specified matters in the proceeding; requiring the Commission to adopt targets by October 1, 2018; requiring the Commission to reevaluate specified determinations in a specified manner; providing for the scope and application of the Act; etc.
Committees
Original:
Economic Matters  
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2016
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/05/2016
Legislative Date
2/08/2016
Action
First Reading Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/08/2016
Legislative Date
2/08/2016
Action
Hearing 2/25 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/14/2016
Legislative Date
3/14/2016
Action
Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters; Withdrawn
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/05/2016 2/08/2016 First Reading Economic Matters
House 2/08/2016 2/08/2016 Hearing 2/25 at 1:00 p.m.
House 3/14/2016 3/14/2016 Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters; Withdrawn
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   1-101, 7-801 through 7-808 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:29 PM