Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Vehicle Laws - Special Event Zones in Worcester County - Penalties
Sponsored by
Delegates Hartman and Otto
Status
In the House - Unfavorable Report by Environment and Transportation; Withdrawn
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Establishing a penalty of up to $1,000 for certain violations of the Maryland Vehicle Law committed within a special event zone in Worcester County.
Committees
Details
Emergency Bill
Cross-filed with: SB0682
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): Upon Enactment
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/08/2019
Legislative Date
2/08/2019
Action
First Reading Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Vehicle Laws - Special Event Zones in Worcester County - Penalties
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/15/2019
Legislative Date
2/15/2019
Action
Hearing 3/08 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/08/2019
Legislative Date
3/08/2019
Action
Hearing canceled
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/11/2019
Legislative Date
3/11/2019
Action
Unfavorable Report by Environment and Transportation; Withdrawn
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/08/2019 2/08/2019 First Reading Environment and Transportation
Text - First - Vehicle Laws - Special Event Zones in Worcester County - Penalties
House 2/15/2019 2/15/2019 Hearing 3/08 at 1:00 p.m.
House 3/08/2019 3/08/2019 Hearing canceled
Vote - House - Committee - Environment and Transportation
House 3/11/2019 3/11/2019 Unfavorable Report by Environment and Transportation; Withdrawn
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   21-1116, 21-1117, 21-1132, 21-811, 21-901.1 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:31 PM