Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
State Employees - Collective Bargaining - Judicial Branch Employees
Sponsored by
Delegate Conaway
Status
In the House - Unfavorable Report by Appropriations; Withdrawn
Analysis
Synopsis
Expanding the scope of provisions of law governing collective bargaining to include all State employees of the Judicial Branch of State government; altering the membership of the State Labor Relations Board to include two members appointed by the Chief Judge of the Court of Appeals; providing that the Chief Judge may remove a member appointed by the Chief Judge only for specified reasons; altering the responsibilities and powers of the Board; etc.
Committees
Original:
Appropriations
Opposite:
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2013
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/05/2013
Legislative Date
2/06/2013
Action
First Reading Appropriations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/15/2013
Legislative Date
2/18/2013
Action
Unfavorable Report by Appropriations; Withdrawn
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/05/2013 2/06/2013 First Reading Appropriations
House 2/15/2013 2/18/2013 Unfavorable Report by Appropriations; Withdrawn
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   3-101, 3-102, 3-201, 3-202, 3-205, 3-403, 3-501, 3-601 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:27 PM