Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Local Government - Restrictions on Income-Producing Real Property - Fiscal Impact Review
Sponsored by
Delegates Holmes, Beidle, Frush, Hogan, McMillan, Norman, Stein, Vitale, and Wilson
Status
In the House - Hearing cancelled
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Requiring the governing body of a county or municipal corporation to provide a copy of rent-control legislation to the Department of Legislative Services prior to enacting the legislation; requiring the Department to prepare a fiscal note and economic impact analysis for the legislation within 30 days; requiring a copy of the fiscal note and economic impact analysis to be provided to specified persons; providing for the prospective application of the Act; etc.
Committees
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0595
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): June 1, 2014
Bill imposes a local government mandate which is a directive in a bill requiring a local government unit to perform a task or assume a responsibility that has a discernible fiscal impact on the local government unit
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/31/2014
Legislative Date
2/03/2014
Action
First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/12/2014
Legislative Date
2/12/2014
Action
Hearing 2/24 at 4:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/12/2014
Legislative Date
2/12/2014
Action
Hearing cancelled
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 1/31/2014 2/03/2014 First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
House 2/12/2014 2/12/2014 Hearing 2/24 at 4:00 p.m.
House 2/12/2014 2/12/2014 Hearing cancelled
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:29 PM