Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
State Government - Maryland Program Evaluation Act - Periodic Full Evaluations
Sponsored by
Delegate Waldstreicher
Status
In the House - Unfavorable Report by House Rules and Executive Nominations
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Requiring the Department of Legislative Services to include certain information in a preliminary evaluation report of certain governmental activities or units; requiring the Department to conduct a certain full evaluation of certain governmental activities or units in certain years and every 30 years thereafter; requiring the Department to conduct subsequent full evaluations of certain entities under certain circumstances; requiring the Department to complete certain full evaluations by December 1 in an evaluation year; etc.
Committees
Details
Introduced in a prior session as: HB1377 Session: 2017 Regular Session
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2018
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/01/2018
Legislative Date
2/01/2018
Action
First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/07/2018
Legislative Date
2/07/2018
Action
Hearing 2/19 at 3:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Rules and Executive Nominations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/29/2018
Legislative Date
3/29/2018
Action
Unfavorable Report by House Rules and Executive Nominations
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/01/2018 2/01/2018 First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
Text - First - State Government - Maryland Program Evaluation Act - Periodic Full Evaluations
House 2/07/2018 2/07/2018 Hearing 2/19 at 3:00 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Rules and Executive Nominations
House 3/29/2018 3/29/2018 Unfavorable Report by House Rules and Executive Nominations
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   8-401, 8-405 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:30 PM