Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Carroll County - Alcoholic Beverages - Beer, Wine, and Liquor Tasting License
Sponsored by
Carroll County Delegation
Status
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 120
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Creating in Carroll County a beer, wine, and liquor (BWL) tasting license; specifying that the Carroll County Board of License Commissioners may issue the license to a holder of a beer, wine, and liquor (BWL) license; authorizing the license holder to allow the consumption of beer, wine, and liquor for tasting under specified circumstances; requiring the Board to regulate the quantity of beer and wine served to specified individuals; establishing an annual license fee of $150 in addition to the cost of a BWL license; etc.
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0746
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2016
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/05/2016
Legislative Date
2/08/2016
Action
First Reading Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/05/2016
Legislative Date
2/05/2016
Action
Hearing 2/22 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/07/2016
Legislative Date
3/08/2016
Action
Favorable Report by Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/09/2016
Legislative Date
3/09/2016
Action
Favorable Report Adopted
Proceedings
41
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/09/2016
Legislative Date
3/09/2016
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
41
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/14/2016
Legislative Date
3/11/2016
Action
Third Reading Passed (136-0)
Proceedings
43A
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/15/2016
Legislative Date
3/15/2016
Action
First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
44
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/01/2016
Legislative Date
4/05/2016
Action
Favorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/05/2016
Legislative Date
3/30/2016
Action
Favorable Report Adopted
Proceedings
59
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/05/2016
Legislative Date
3/30/2016
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
59
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/06/2016
Legislative Date
3/31/2016
Action
Third Reading Passed (46-0)
Proceedings
60
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/07/2016
Legislative Date
3/31/2016
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
63
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
4/12/2016
Legislative Date
4/12/2016
Action
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 120
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/05/2016 2/08/2016 First Reading Economic Matters
House 2/05/2016 2/05/2016 Hearing 2/22 at 1:00 p.m.
House 3/07/2016 3/08/2016 Favorable Report by Economic Matters
House 3/09/2016 3/09/2016 Favorable Report Adopted 41
House 3/09/2016 3/09/2016 Second Reading Passed 41
House 3/14/2016 3/11/2016 Third Reading Passed (136-0) 43A
Senate 3/15/2016 3/15/2016 First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs 44
Senate 4/01/2016 4/05/2016 Favorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 4/05/2016 3/30/2016 Favorable Report Adopted 59
Senate 4/05/2016 3/30/2016 Second Reading Passed 59
Senate 4/06/2016 3/31/2016 Third Reading Passed (46-0) 60
House 4/07/2016 3/31/2016 Returned Passed 63
Post Passage 4/12/2016 4/12/2016 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 120
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:29 PM