Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Public Work Contracts - Payroll Reporting Requirements (The Transparency Act of 2016)
Sponsored by
Delegates McCray, Morales, Anderson, Angel, Barron, Barve, Carr, Carter, Chang, Conaway, Frick, Glenn, Hayes, Lafferty, Lam, Lierman, Luedtke, McIntosh, Moon, Oaks, Pena-Melnyk, Platt, Sample-Hughes, Smith, Tarlau, Turner, A. Washington, M. Washington, and C. Wilson
Status
In the House - Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Applying specified payroll reporting requirements under the prevailing wage law to specified contractors under specified public work contracts with a value of at least $400,000; and providing that specified contractors under specified public work contracts with a value of less than $500,000 are not required to comply with specified payroll reporting requirements under the prevailing wage law.
Committees
Original:
Economic Matters  
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0914
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2016
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/05/2016
Legislative Date
2/08/2016
Action
First Reading Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/08/2016
Legislative Date
2/08/2016
Action
Hearing 2/23 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/26/2016
Legislative Date
2/29/2016
Action
Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/05/2016 2/08/2016 First Reading Economic Matters
House 2/08/2016 2/08/2016 Hearing 2/23 at 1:00 p.m.
House 2/26/2016 2/29/2016 Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:29 PM