Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Pharmacy Benefits Managers - Pharmacy Contracts - Maximum Allowable Cost Pricing
Sponsored by
Delegates Kach, Bromwell, Elliott, Olszewski, Costa, Cullison, Donoghue, Hammen, Hubbard, A. Kelly, Kipke, Krebs, McDonough, Morhaim, Murphy, Nathan-Pulliam, Oaks, Pena-Melnyk, Pendergrass, Ready, Reznik, Tarrant, and V. Turner
Status
Vetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Requiring a pharmacy benefits manager to include, in each contract with a contracted pharmacy, the sources used to determine maximum allowable cost pricing; requiring the pharmacy benefits manager to update its pricing information with a specified frequency and provide a means by which contracted pharmacies may review pricing updates in a specified format; etc.
Committees
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0952
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): January 1, 2015
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/31/2014
Legislative Date
2/03/2014
Action
First Reading Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/05/2014
Legislative Date
2/05/2014
Action
Hearing 2/20 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/14/2014
Legislative Date
3/15/2014
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/15/2014
Legislative Date
3/12/2014
Action
Favorable with Amendments {776180/1 Report Adopted
Proceedings
48
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/15/2014
Legislative Date
3/12/2014
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
48
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/17/2014
Legislative Date
3/13/2014
Action
Third Reading Passed (136-0)
Proceedings
49
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/18/2014
Legislative Date
3/13/2014
Action
First Reading Finance
Proceedings
47
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/19/2014
Legislative Date
3/19/2014
Action
Hearing 4/01 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/02/2014
Legislative Date
4/03/2014
Action
Favorable Report by Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/03/2014
Legislative Date
3/25/2014
Action
Favorable Report Adopted
Proceedings
59
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/03/2014
Legislative Date
3/25/2014
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
59
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/05/2014
Legislative Date
3/27/2014
Action
Third Reading Passed (46-0)
Proceedings
61
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/05/2014
Legislative Date
3/29/2014
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
65
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
5/15/2014
Legislative Date
5/15/2014
Action
Vetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 1/31/2014 2/03/2014 First Reading Health and Government Operations
House 2/05/2014 2/05/2014 Hearing 2/20 at 1:00 p.m.
House 3/14/2014 3/15/2014 Favorable with Amendments Report by Health and Government Operations
House 3/15/2014 3/12/2014 Favorable with Amendments {776180/1 Report Adopted 48
House 3/15/2014 3/12/2014 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 48
House 3/17/2014 3/13/2014 Third Reading Passed (136-0) 49
Senate 3/18/2014 3/13/2014 First Reading Finance 47
Senate 3/19/2014 3/19/2014 Hearing 4/01 at 1:00 p.m.
Senate 4/02/2014 4/03/2014 Favorable Report by Finance
Senate 4/03/2014 3/25/2014 Favorable Report Adopted 59
Senate 4/03/2014 3/25/2014 Second Reading Passed 59
Senate 4/05/2014 3/27/2014 Third Reading Passed (46-0) 61
House 4/05/2014 3/29/2014 Returned Passed 65
Post Passage 5/15/2014 5/15/2014 Vetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   15-1628.1 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:29 PM