Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Maryland Unaccompanied Homeless Youth and Young Adult Count Demonstration Project
Sponsored by
Delegates M. Washington, Branch, Braveboy, Cullison, Davis, Donoghue, Dumais, Glenn, Harper, Haynes, Kaiser, A. Kelly, McIntosh, A. Miller, S. Robinson, Rudolph, and Zucker
Status
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 425
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Establishing the Maryland Unaccompanied Homeless Youth and Young Adult Count Demonstration Project; requiring the Department of Housing and Community Development to select and monitor a coordinating entity to oversee the Project; requiring the coordinating entity to be selected through a competitive request for proposal or by sole source contract; requiring the coordinating entity to determine the number and characteristics of specified unaccompanied homeless youth and young adults; making the Act subject to a contingency; etc.
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0794
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2014
Contingency - on funding
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/31/2014
Legislative Date
2/03/2014
Action
First Reading Environmental Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/06/2014
Legislative Date
2/06/2014
Action
Reassigned to Appropriations
Proceedings
22
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/19/2014
Legislative Date
2/19/2014
Action
Hearing 3/04 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/13/2014
Legislative Date
3/14/2014
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Appropriations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/14/2014
Legislative Date
3/11/2014
Action
Favorable with Amendments {934768/1 Report Adopted
Proceedings
47
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/14/2014
Legislative Date
3/11/2014
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
47
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/15/2014
Legislative Date
3/12/2014
Action
Third Reading Passed (131-0)
Proceedings
48A
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/18/2014
Legislative Date
3/13/2014
Action
First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
47
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/31/2014
Legislative Date
3/31/2014
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/01/2014
Legislative Date
3/23/2014
Action
Favorable with Amendments {764731/1 Report Adopted
Proceedings
57
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/01/2014
Legislative Date
3/23/2014
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
57
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/02/2014
Legislative Date
3/24/2014
Action
Third Reading Passed with Amendments (47-0)
Proceedings
58
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/03/2014
Legislative Date
3/27/2014
Action
House Refuses to Concur - Senate Amendments
Proceedings
63
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/03/2014
Legislative Date
3/27/2014
Action
House Requests Senate Recede
Proceedings
63
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/03/2014
Legislative Date
3/27/2014
Action
Conference Committee Appointed
Proceedings
63
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/03/2014
Legislative Date
3/27/2014
Action
Delegates James, Haynes, and Szeliga
Proceedings
63
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/04/2014
Legislative Date
3/26/2014
Action
Senate Refuses to Recede
Proceedings
60
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/05/2014
Legislative Date
3/30/2014
Action
House Concur - Senate Amendments
Proceedings
66
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/05/2014
Legislative Date
3/30/2014
Action
Third Reading Passed (133-0)
Proceedings
66
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/05/2014
Legislative Date
3/30/2014
Action
Passed Enrolled
Proceedings
66
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
5/05/2014
Legislative Date
5/05/2014
Action
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 425
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 1/31/2014 2/03/2014 First Reading Environmental Matters
House 2/06/2014 2/06/2014 Reassigned to Appropriations 22
House 2/19/2014 2/19/2014 Hearing 3/04 at 1:00 p.m.
House 3/13/2014 3/14/2014 Favorable with Amendments Report by Appropriations
House 3/14/2014 3/11/2014 Favorable with Amendments {934768/1 Report Adopted 47
House 3/14/2014 3/11/2014 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 47
House 3/15/2014 3/12/2014 Third Reading Passed (131-0) 48A
Senate 3/18/2014 3/13/2014 First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs 47
Senate 3/31/2014 3/31/2014 Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 4/01/2014 3/23/2014 Favorable with Amendments {764731/1 Report Adopted 57
Senate 4/01/2014 3/23/2014 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 57
Senate 4/02/2014 3/24/2014 Third Reading Passed with Amendments (47-0) 58
House 4/03/2014 3/27/2014 House Refuses to Concur - Senate Amendments 63
House 4/03/2014 3/27/2014 House Requests Senate Recede 63
House 4/03/2014 3/27/2014 Conference Committee Appointed 63
House 4/03/2014 3/27/2014 Delegates James, Haynes, and Szeliga 63
Senate 4/04/2014 3/26/2014 Senate Refuses to Recede 60
House 4/05/2014 3/30/2014 House Concur - Senate Amendments 66
House 4/05/2014 3/30/2014 Third Reading Passed (133-0) 66
House 4/05/2014 3/30/2014 Passed Enrolled 66
Post Passage 5/05/2014 5/05/2014 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 425
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:29 PM