Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Public Banking Institutions - Authorization and Task Force
Sponsored by
Delegates Gutierrez, Luedtke, and Moon
Status
In the House - Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Authorizing a political subdivision to establish a public banking institution within the jurisdiction of the political subdivision and act as an incorporator to establish the public banking institution; establishing the Maryland State Banking Task Force to review and evaluate the creation of a Maryland State Bank; requiring that on or before December 1, 2016, the Task Force shall report its findings and recommendations to the Governor and specified committees of the General Assembly; etc.
Committees
Original:
Economic Matters  
Details
Introduced in a prior session as: HB1306 Session: 2013 Regular Session
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): June 1, 2016, October 1, 2016
Creates a Task Force or Commission
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/05/2016
Legislative Date
2/08/2016
Action
First Reading Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/08/2016
Legislative Date
2/08/2016
Action
Hearing 2/24 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/26/2016
Legislative Date
2/29/2016
Action
Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/05/2016 2/08/2016 First Reading Economic Matters
House 2/08/2016 2/08/2016 Hearing 2/24 at 1:00 p.m.
House 2/26/2016 2/29/2016 Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:29 PM