Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Education - Educational Interpreters - Certification Requirements
Sponsored by
Delegates Qi, Acevero, Bhandari, Boyce, Charles, Crutchfield, Cullison, Feldmark, Guyton, Krimm, R. Lewis, Lierman, Luedtke, Palakovich Carr, Shetty, and Wilkins
Status
In the House - Hearing 2/21 at 1:00 p.m.
Analysis
Synopsis
Requiring the State Board of Education and the Professional Standards and Teacher Education Board to develop certain rules and regulations for the certification of educational interpreters; providing that certain individuals who are deaf or hard of hearing may not be denied the right to receive certain credentials or contract for work for which the individual is otherwise qualified because the individual is deaf or hard of hearing; requiring certain educational interpreters to obtain certification on or before July 1, 2027; etc.
Committees
Original:
Ways and Means
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2020
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/03/2020
Legislative Date
2/03/2020
Action
First Reading Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Education - Educational Interpreters - Certification Requirements
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/06/2020
Legislative Date
2/06/2020
Action
Hearing 2/21 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/03/2020 2/03/2020 First Reading Ways and Means
Text - First - Education - Educational Interpreters - Certification Requirements
House 2/06/2020 2/06/2020 Hearing 2/21 at 1:00 p.m.
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
Last Updated: 2/6/2020 3:55 PM