Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Maryland Environmental Service - Collective Bargaining
Sponsored by
Delegates P. Young, Morales, B. Barnes, Chang, Cullison, Davis, Frick, Glenn, Gutierrez, Haynes, Healey, Hixson, C. Howard, Jackson, Jones, Kaiser, Kelly, Korman, Lam, Lierman, Luedtke, McCray, Moon, Pena-Melnyk, Platt, Reznik, Sanchez, Sophocleus, Tarlau, Valderrama, Valentino-Smith, Waldstreicher, and M. Washington
Status
In the House - Unfavorable Report by Appropriations; Withdrawn
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Requiring the Maryland Environmental Service, consistent with specified provisions of law, to recognize and deal with specified employee organizations, to collectively bargain, and to enter into specified types of agreements applicable to specified State employees; and providing for an exception to an exemption from specified provisions of State personnel law.
Committees
Original:
Appropriations  
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2016
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/05/2016
Legislative Date
2/08/2016
Action
First Reading Appropriations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/10/2016
Legislative Date
2/10/2016
Action
Hearing 2/23 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/11/2016
Legislative Date
4/11/2016
Action
Unfavorable Report by Appropriations; Withdrawn
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/05/2016 2/08/2016 First Reading Appropriations
House 2/10/2016 2/10/2016 Hearing 2/23 at 1:00 p.m.
House 4/11/2016 4/11/2016 Unfavorable Report by Appropriations; Withdrawn
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   3-103.1, 3-103.2 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:29 PM