Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Northeast Maryland Waste Disposal Authority - Executive Director and General Counsel - Appointment and Compensation
Sponsored by
Delegates W. Miller and K. Young
Status
In the House - Unfavorable Report by Environment and Transportation
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Providing that the Governor rather than the Northeast Maryland Waste Disposal Authority appoint the executive director and the general counsel for the Authority; and requiring the Northeast Maryland Waste Disposal Authority to recommend to the Governor compensation for the executive director and the general counsel.
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2015
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/12/2015
Legislative Date
2/13/2015
Action
First Reading Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/13/2015
Legislative Date
2/13/2015
Action
Hearing 3/11 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/19/2015
Legislative Date
3/20/2015
Action
Unfavorable Report by Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/12/2015 2/13/2015 First Reading Environment and Transportation
House 2/13/2015 2/13/2015 Hearing 3/11 at 1:00 p.m.
House 3/19/2015 3/20/2015 Unfavorable Report by Environment and Transportation
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:29 PM
Click to return on the top page