Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Baltimore City - Landlord and Tenant Law - Actions for Repossession (Fairness and Integrity for Baltimore City Renters Act)
Sponsored by
Delegates Rosenberg, Oaks, and Anderson
Status
In the House - Unfavorable Report by Environment and Transportation; Withdrawn
Analysis
Synopsis
Repealing and adding specified provisions in the Public Local Laws of Baltimore City concerning landlord and tenant law and the repossession of premises; requiring a landlord to maintain specified records for payments of rent and other charges; establishing specified procedures for repossession by a landlord when a tenant fails to pay rent when due; requiring a sheriff to serve a specified summons in a specified manner; establishing a specified tenant legal assistance special fund and a $30 surcharge on the filing of an eviction complaint; etc.
Committees
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0801
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2016
Bill imposes a local government mandate which is a directive in a bill requiring a local government unit to perform a task or assume a responsibility that has a discernible fiscal impact on the local government unit
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/05/2016
Legislative Date
2/08/2016
Action
First Reading Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/25/2016
Legislative Date
3/28/2016
Action
Unfavorable Report by Environment and Transportation; Withdrawn
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/05/2016 2/08/2016 First Reading Environment and Transportation
House 3/25/2016 3/28/2016 Unfavorable Report by Environment and Transportation; Withdrawn
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   9-1 through 9-3, 9-1 through 9-7, 9-10 through 9-14.2, 9-14.2, 9-8, 9-9, 9-9A )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:29 PM