Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Transportation Projects - Transportation Facilities - Water Access
Sponsored by
Delegates McIntosh, Frush, S. Robinson, Beidle, Carr, Kipke, McMillan, Norman, and Weir
Status
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 140
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Requiring the Department of Transportation and local governments, in developing a construction or improvement project involving a bridge or other transportation facility that is adjacent to or that crosses a waterway, to consider any reasonable and appropriate measures to provide or improve specified water access for specified activities; requiring the Department and local governments, in consultation with specified entities, to establish specified standards and guidelines; etc.
Committees
Opposite:
Finance  
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2013
Bill imposes a local government mandate which is a directive in a bill requiring a local government unit to perform a task or assume a responsibility that has a discernible fiscal impact on the local government unit
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/05/2013
Legislative Date
2/06/2013
Action
First Reading Environmental Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/06/2013
Legislative Date
2/06/2013
Action
Hearing 2/26 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/22/2013
Legislative Date
3/23/2013
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Environmental Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/23/2013
Legislative Date
3/20/2013
Action
Favorable with Amendments {590719/2 Report Adopted
Proceedings
53
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/23/2013
Legislative Date
3/20/2013
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
53
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/25/2013
Legislative Date
3/21/2013
Action
Third Reading Passed (130-3)
Proceedings
54
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/25/2013
Legislative Date
3/21/2013
Action
First Reading Finance
Proceedings
52
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/26/2013
Legislative Date
3/26/2013
Action
Hearing 4/02 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/02/2013
Legislative Date
4/03/2013
Action
Favorable Report by Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/03/2013
Legislative Date
3/29/2013
Action
Favorable Report Adopted
Proceedings
60
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/03/2013
Legislative Date
3/29/2013
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
60
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/04/2013
Legislative Date
3/30/2013
Action
Third Reading Passed (47-0)
Proceedings
61
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/04/2013
Legislative Date
3/30/2013
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
63
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
4/09/2013
Legislative Date
4/09/2013
Action
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 140
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/05/2013 2/06/2013 First Reading Environmental Matters
House 2/06/2013 2/06/2013 Hearing 2/26 at 1:00 p.m.
House 3/22/2013 3/23/2013 Favorable with Amendments Report by Environmental Matters
House 3/23/2013 3/20/2013 Favorable with Amendments {590719/2 Report Adopted 53
House 3/23/2013 3/20/2013 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 53
House 3/25/2013 3/21/2013 Third Reading Passed (130-3) 54
Senate 3/25/2013 3/21/2013 First Reading Finance 52
Senate 3/26/2013 3/26/2013 Hearing 4/02 at 1:00 p.m.
Senate 4/02/2013 4/03/2013 Favorable Report by Finance
Senate 4/03/2013 3/29/2013 Favorable Report Adopted 60
Senate 4/03/2013 3/29/2013 Second Reading Passed 60
Senate 4/04/2013 3/30/2013 Third Reading Passed (47-0) 61
House 4/04/2013 3/30/2013 Returned Passed 63
Post Passage 4/09/2013 4/09/2013 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 140
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   2-103.1 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:27 PM