Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Life Insurance and Annuities - Duty to Search Death Master File and Locate Beneficiaries
Sponsored by
Delegates Tarrant and Kipke
Status
In the House - Unfavorable Report by Health and Government Operations
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Altering the applicability of provisions of law relating to searches of a specified death master file in connection with life insurance policies and annuity contracts issued, delivered, or renewed in the State by specified insurers to exclude a policy of life insurance issued or delivered before a specified date by a specified insurer; requiring specified insurers to establish procedures for periodically contacting specified individuals for a specified purpose; etc.
Committees
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0690
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): June 1, 2014
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/31/2014
Legislative Date
2/03/2014
Action
First Reading Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/05/2014
Legislative Date
2/05/2014
Action
Hearing 2/27 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/07/2014
Legislative Date
3/11/2014
Action
Unfavorable Report by Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 1/31/2014 2/03/2014 First Reading Health and Government Operations
House 2/05/2014 2/05/2014 Hearing 2/27 at 1:00 p.m.
House 3/07/2014 3/11/2014 Unfavorable Report by Health and Government Operations
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   16-118 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:29 PM