Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
State Court Administrator - Warrants of Restitution and Writs of Possession - Data Collection and Reporting
Sponsored by
Delegates Boyce, Lierman, McIntosh, Stewart, and Wells
Status
In the House - Hearing 2/19 at 1:00 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Requiring the State Court Administrator to collect, maintain, provide certain access to, and, on or before July 1, 2021, and quarterly thereafter, make and publish on a website accessible to the public a report on certain information related to certain warrants of restitution and writs of possession.
Committees
Original:
Judiciary  
Committee Testimony
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0544
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): January 1, 2021
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/03/2020
Legislative Date
2/03/2020
Action
First Reading Judiciary
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/04/2020
Legislative Date
2/04/2020
Action
Hearing 2/19 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/03/2020 2/03/2020 First Reading Judiciary
Text - First - State Court Administrator - Warrants of Restitution and Writs of Possession - Data Collection and Reporting
House 2/04/2020 2/04/2020 Hearing 2/19 at 1:00 p.m.
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
Last Updated: 9/22/2020 2:06 PM