Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Montgomery County - Property Tax - Credit for Senior Citizen Volunteers MC 23-20
Sponsored by
Montgomery County Delegation
Status
In the House - Unfavorable Report by Ways and Means; Withdrawn
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Authorizing the governing body of Montgomery County to grant, by law, a property tax credit against the county property tax imposed on a dwelling owned by an individual who is at least 65 years old who volunteers for a public school or nonprofit organization located in or operating in Montgomery County; authorizing the governing body of Montgomery County to provide, by law, for certain matters relating to the property tax credit; applying the Act to taxable years beginning after June 30, 2020; etc.
Committees
Original:
Ways and Means
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): June 1, 2020
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/03/2020
Legislative Date
2/03/2020
Action
First Reading Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/04/2020
Legislative Date
2/04/2020
Action
Hearing 2/18 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/17/2020
Legislative Date
2/17/2020
Action
Hearing canceled
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/17/2020
Legislative Date
2/17/2020
Action
Hearing 2/25 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/20/2020
Legislative Date
2/20/2020
Action
Hearing canceled
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/21/2020
Legislative Date
2/21/2020
Action
Unfavorable Report by Ways and Means; Withdrawn
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/03/2020 2/03/2020 First Reading Ways and Means
Text - First - Montgomery County - Property Tax - Credit for Senior Citizen Volunteers MC 23-20
House 2/04/2020 2/04/2020 Hearing 2/18 at 1:00 p.m.
House 2/17/2020 2/17/2020 Hearing canceled
House 2/17/2020 2/17/2020 Hearing 2/25 at 1:00 p.m.
House 2/20/2020 2/20/2020 Hearing canceled
Vote - House - Committee - Ways and Means
House 2/21/2020 2/21/2020 Unfavorable Report by Ways and Means; Withdrawn
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
Last Updated: 2/21/2020 8:51 AM