Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Environment - Water Pollution Control - Penalty
Sponsored by
Delegate Frush
Status
In the House - Unfavorable Report by Environmental Matters
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Increasing a specified penalty for specified violations of the water pollution control law.
Committees
Opposite:
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0289
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2013
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/05/2013
Legislative Date
2/06/2013
Action
First Reading Environmental Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/06/2013
Legislative Date
2/06/2013
Action
Hearing 2/22 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/21/2013
Legislative Date
2/21/2013
Action
Hearing cancelled
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/21/2013
Legislative Date
2/21/2013
Action
Hearing 2/22 at 2:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/18/2013
Legislative Date
3/18/2013
Action
Unfavorable Report by Environmental Matters
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/05/2013 2/06/2013 First Reading Environmental Matters
House 2/06/2013 2/06/2013 Hearing 2/22 at 1:00 p.m.
House 2/21/2013 2/21/2013 Hearing cancelled
House 2/21/2013 2/21/2013 Hearing 2/22 at 2:00 p.m.
House 3/18/2013 3/18/2013 Unfavorable Report by Environmental Matters
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   9-342 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:27 PM