Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Washington County - Maryland Building Performance Standards - Modifications - Local Enforcement
Sponsored by
Washington County Delegation
Status
In the House - First Reading Environment and Transportation
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Requiring Washington County to implement and enforce modifications of the Maryland Building Performance Standards adopted by the State no later than 6 months after adoption for specified portions of the Standards, starting with modifications that are effective on January 1, 2015, and every 6 years thereafter.
Committees
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0638
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2015
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/12/2015
Legislative Date
2/13/2015
Action
First Reading Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/12/2015 2/13/2015 First Reading Environment and Transportation
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   12-505 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:29 PM