Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Vehicle Laws - Unlawful Use of Off-Highway Recreational Vehicles - Administrative Penalties
Sponsored by
Delegates Tarrant, Anderson, Branch, Clippinger, Hammen, Haynes, McHale, McIntosh, Mitchell, Oaks, B. Robinson, Stukes, and M. Washington
Status
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 641
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Requiring the clerk of the court to report to the Motor Vehicle Administration the adjudication of a minor as delinquent or a finding that a minor has committed a delinquent act for a specified highway violation involving the use of an off-highway recreational vehicle; requiring the Administration to suspend the driver's license of a minor for specified time periods if it receives a report from the clerk of the court; etc.
Committees
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2013
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/05/2013
Legislative Date
2/06/2013
Action
First Reading Environmental Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/06/2013
Legislative Date
2/06/2013
Action
Hearing 2/26 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/04/2013
Legislative Date
4/04/2013
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Environmental Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/04/2013
Legislative Date
3/29/2013
Action
Favorable with Amendments {930313/1 Report Adopted
Proceedings
62
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/04/2013
Legislative Date
3/29/2013
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
62
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/04/2013
Legislative Date
3/30/2013
Action
Third Reading Passed (109-26)
Proceedings
63
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/05/2013
Legislative Date
3/31/2013
Action
First Reading Senate Rules
Proceedings
62
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/05/2013
Legislative Date
4/05/2013
Action
Rereferred to Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/08/2013
Legislative Date
4/08/2013
Action
Hearing 4/08 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/08/2013
Legislative Date
4/08/2013
Action
Favorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/08/2013
Legislative Date
4/05/2013
Action
Favorable Report Adopted
Proceedings
67
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/08/2013
Legislative Date
4/05/2013
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
67
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/08/2013
Legislative Date
4/06/2013
Action
Third Reading Passed (46-0)
Proceedings
68
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/08/2013
Legislative Date
4/05/2013
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
69
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
5/16/2013
Legislative Date
5/16/2013
Action
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 641
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/05/2013 2/06/2013 First Reading Environmental Matters
House 2/06/2013 2/06/2013 Hearing 2/26 at 1:00 p.m.
House 4/04/2013 4/04/2013 Favorable with Amendments Report by Environmental Matters
House 4/04/2013 3/29/2013 Favorable with Amendments {930313/1 Report Adopted 62
House 4/04/2013 3/29/2013 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 62
House 4/04/2013 3/30/2013 Third Reading Passed (109-26) 63
Senate 4/05/2013 3/31/2013 First Reading Senate Rules 62
Senate 4/05/2013 4/05/2013 Rereferred to Judicial Proceedings
Senate 4/08/2013 4/08/2013 Hearing 4/08 at 1:00 p.m.
Senate 4/08/2013 4/08/2013 Favorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
Senate 4/08/2013 4/05/2013 Favorable Report Adopted 67
Senate 4/08/2013 4/05/2013 Second Reading Passed 67
Senate 4/08/2013 4/06/2013 Third Reading Passed (46-0) 68
House 4/08/2013 4/05/2013 Returned Passed 69
Post Passage 5/16/2013 5/16/2013 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 641
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   13-401, 16-206 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:27 PM