Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Maryland Medical Assistance Program - Telemedicine
Sponsored by
Delegates Lee, Smigiel, Nathan-Pulliam, Carr, Cullison, Elliott, Gutierrez, Guzzone, Healey, Howard, A. Kelly, Krebs, McComas, McDonough, A. Miller, Murphy, B. Robinson, Simmons, Stocksdale, and A. Washington
Status
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 426
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Requiring, to the extent authorized by federal law or regulation, specified provisions of law relating to coverage of and reimbursement for health care services delivered through telemedicine to apply to the Maryland Medical Assistance Program and managed care organizations in a specified manner; authorizing the Department of Health and Mental Hygiene to allow coverage of and reimbursement for health care services delivered in a specified manner and subject to the limitations of the State budget; etc.
Committees
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0198
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2014
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/31/2014
Legislative Date
2/03/2014
Action
First Reading Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/05/2014
Legislative Date
2/05/2014
Action
Hearing 2/18 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/28/2014
Legislative Date
3/04/2014
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/05/2014
Legislative Date
3/05/2014
Action
Favorable with Amendments {156387/1 Report Adopted
Proceedings
41
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/05/2014
Legislative Date
3/05/2014
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
41
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/10/2014
Legislative Date
3/07/2014
Action
Third Reading Passed (127-0)
Proceedings
43A
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/11/2014
Legislative Date
3/08/2014
Action
First Reading Finance
Proceedings
42
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/19/2014
Legislative Date
3/19/2014
Action
Hearing 3/26 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/01/2014
Legislative Date
4/02/2014
Action
Favorable Report by Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/03/2014
Legislative Date
3/25/2014
Action
Favorable Report Adopted
Proceedings
59
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/03/2014
Legislative Date
3/25/2014
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
59
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/05/2014
Legislative Date
3/27/2014
Action
Third Reading Passed (46-0)
Proceedings
61
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/05/2014
Legislative Date
3/29/2014
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
65
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
5/05/2014
Legislative Date
5/05/2014
Action
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 426
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 1/31/2014 2/03/2014 First Reading Health and Government Operations
House 2/05/2014 2/05/2014 Hearing 2/18 at 1:00 p.m.
House 2/28/2014 3/04/2014 Favorable with Amendments Report by Health and Government Operations
House 3/05/2014 3/05/2014 Favorable with Amendments {156387/1 Report Adopted 41
House 3/05/2014 3/05/2014 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 41
House 3/10/2014 3/07/2014 Third Reading Passed (127-0) 43A
Senate 3/11/2014 3/08/2014 First Reading Finance 42
Senate 3/19/2014 3/19/2014 Hearing 3/26 at 1:00 p.m.
Senate 4/01/2014 4/02/2014 Favorable Report by Finance
Senate 4/03/2014 3/25/2014 Favorable Report Adopted 59
Senate 4/03/2014 3/25/2014 Second Reading Passed 59
Senate 4/05/2014 3/27/2014 Third Reading Passed (46-0) 61
House 4/05/2014 3/29/2014 Returned Passed 65
Post Passage 5/05/2014 5/05/2014 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 426
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   15-105.2 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:29 PM