Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Creation of a State Debt - Somerset County - Teackle Mansion and the Sarah Martin Done House
Sponsored by
Delegate Otto
Status
In the House - Unfavorable Report by Appropriations
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Bond Bill Fact Sheet
Synopsis
Authorizing the creation of a State Debt not to exceed $250,000, the proceeds to be used as a grant to the Board of Directors of the Somerset Co Historical Society Inc. for the acquisition, planning, design, construction, repair, renovation, reconstruction, site improvement, and capital equipping of the Teackle Mansion and the Sarah Martin Done House, located in Somerset County; providing for disbursement of the loan proceeds, subject to a requirement that the grantee provide and expend a matching fund; etc.
Committees
Original:
Appropriations  
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0863
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): June 1, 2017
NOTE: Bond bills that received funding in fiscal 2018 were amended into the State's Capital budget (HB 151). Individual bond bills were not acted upon by the legislature, instead the General Assembly amended HB 151 to specifically list the projects it selected for Bond Funding.
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/03/2017
Legislative Date
2/03/2017
Action
First Reading Appropriations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/01/2017
Legislative Date
3/01/2017
Action
Hearing 3/13 at 11:30 a.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/10/2017
Legislative Date
4/10/2017
Action
Unfavorable Report by Appropriations
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/03/2017 2/03/2017 First Reading Appropriations
Text - First - Creation of a State Debt - Somerset County - Teackle Mansion and the Sarah Martin Done House
House 3/01/2017 3/01/2017 Hearing 3/13 at 11:30 a.m.
House 4/10/2017 4/10/2017 Unfavorable Report by Appropriations
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:31 PM