Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Courts and Judicial Proceedings - Crime Victims and Witnesses Funds - Court Costs
Sponsored by
Delegates Lee, Cullison, Gutierrez, A. Kelly, McConkey, McDermott, Niemann, Proctor, Simmons, Swain, Vallario, and Waldstreicher
Status
In the House - Unfavorable Report by Judiciary; Withdrawn
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Increasing specified costs imposed by a circuit court and the District Court for specified crimes and offenses; increasing the amount of money from specified fees collected by a circuit court and the District Court that the Comptroller must deposit into the State Victims of Crime Fund; and excluding specified fees collected under the Act from a specified calculation relating to the amount of money that the Comptroller must deposit into the Criminal Injuries Compensation Fund and the State Victims of Crime Fund.
Committees
Original:
Judiciary  
Details
Cross-filed with: SB1005
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2014
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/31/2014
Legislative Date
2/03/2014
Action
First Reading Judiciary
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/05/2014
Legislative Date
2/05/2014
Action
Hearing 2/25 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/07/2014
Legislative Date
4/07/2014
Action
Unfavorable Report by Judiciary; Withdrawn
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 1/31/2014 2/03/2014 First Reading Judiciary
House 2/05/2014 2/05/2014 Hearing 2/25 at 1:00 p.m.
House 4/07/2014 4/07/2014 Unfavorable Report by Judiciary; Withdrawn
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:29 PM