Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Statewide Information Technology Master Plan - Inclusion of Cybersecurity Framework - Requirement
Sponsored by
Delegates Lee, Carr, Conway, Cullison, DeBoy, George, Glenn, Gutierrez, Hough, Howard, A. Kelly, Kipke, McComas, McDonough, Rudolph, Sophocleus, Stocksdale, Szeliga, F. Turner, Valentino-Smith, and M. Washington
Status
In the House - Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Requiring that the statewide information technology master plan developed by the Secretary of Information Technology include a cybersecurity framework; and requiring that the Secretary consider materials developed by the National Institute of Standards and Technology in developing or modifying the cybersecurity framework.
Committees
Original:
Economic Matters  
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0197
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2014
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/31/2014
Legislative Date
2/03/2014
Action
First Reading Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/04/2014
Legislative Date
2/04/2014
Action
Hearing 2/26 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/13/2014
Legislative Date
3/14/2014
Action
Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 1/31/2014 2/03/2014 First Reading Economic Matters
House 2/04/2014 2/04/2014 Hearing 2/26 at 1:00 p.m.
House 3/13/2014 3/14/2014 Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:29 PM