Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Maryland Health Benefit Exchange - Individual Exchange - Copper Plans to Lower Rates
Sponsored by
Delegates Morgan, Szeliga, Arikan, Buckel, Chisholm, Clark, Corderman, M. Fisher, Hornberger, Howard, Jacobs, Kipke, Krebs, Long, Malone, McComas, McKay, Metzgar, Otto, Rose, and Saab
Status
In the House - Unfavorable Report by Health and Government Operations; Withdrawn
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Requiring the Maryland Health Benefit Exchange, contingent on the approval of a waiver application under a certain provision of federal law, to make copper plans available in the Individual Exchange to certain individuals; requiring the Exchange to certify a certain health benefit plan as a copper plan if the plan provides certain coverage; requiring the Exchange, on or before October 1, 2019, to apply to certain officials for a certain waiver in order to implement the provision of copper plans in the State; etc.
Committees
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): June 1, 2019
Contingency - on a contingency described in Sec. 4 of the bill
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/08/2019
Legislative Date
2/08/2019
Action
First Reading Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/13/2019
Legislative Date
2/13/2019
Action
Hearing 3/14 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/05/2019
Legislative Date
4/05/2019
Action
Unfavorable Report by Health and Government Operations; Withdrawn
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/08/2019 2/08/2019 First Reading Health and Government Operations
Text - First - Maryland Health Benefit Exchange - Individual Exchange - Copper Plans to Lower Rates
House 2/13/2019 2/13/2019 Hearing 3/14 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Health and Government Operations
House 4/05/2019 4/05/2019 Unfavorable Report by Health and Government Operations; Withdrawn
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   15-1303, 31-101, 31-108, 31-113.1, 31-115, 31-115.1, 31-116 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:31 PM