Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Criminal Law - Burglary in the First Degree - Home Invasion
Sponsored by
Delegates Lee, Clippinger, Cullison, DeBoy, Gutierrez, Healey, Howard, A. Kelly, McComas, McDonough, McMillan, B. Robinson, S. Robinson, and Stocksdale
Status
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 238
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Increasing the maximum penalty of imprisonment for breaking and entering the dwelling of another with the intent to commit a crime of violence; establishing penalties of up to 25 years imprisonment for specified criminal violations of the Act; etc.
Committees
Original:
Judiciary  
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0742
Introduced in a prior session as: HB0940 Session: 2013 Regular Session
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2014
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/31/2014
Legislative Date
2/03/2014
Action
First Reading Judiciary
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/07/2014
Legislative Date
2/07/2014
Action
Hearing 2/27 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/12/2014
Legislative Date
3/13/2014
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Judiciary
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/13/2014
Legislative Date
3/10/2014
Action
Favorable with Amendments {912518/1 Report Adopted
Proceedings
46
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/13/2014
Legislative Date
3/10/2014
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
46
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/14/2014
Legislative Date
3/11/2014
Action
Third Reading Passed (137-0)
Proceedings
47
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/18/2014
Legislative Date
3/13/2014
Action
First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
47
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/02/2014
Legislative Date
4/03/2014
Action
Favorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/04/2014
Legislative Date
3/26/2014
Action
Favorable Report Adopted
Proceedings
60
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/04/2014
Legislative Date
3/26/2014
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
60
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/07/2014
Legislative Date
3/28/2014
Action
Third Reading Passed (46-0)
Proceedings
62
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/07/2014
Legislative Date
4/01/2014
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
68
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
4/14/2014
Legislative Date
4/14/2014
Action
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 238
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 1/31/2014 2/03/2014 First Reading Judiciary
House 2/07/2014 2/07/2014 Hearing 2/27 at 1:00 p.m.
House 3/12/2014 3/13/2014 Favorable with Amendments Report by Judiciary
House 3/13/2014 3/10/2014 Favorable with Amendments {912518/1 Report Adopted 46
House 3/13/2014 3/10/2014 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 46
House 3/14/2014 3/11/2014 Third Reading Passed (137-0) 47
Senate 3/18/2014 3/13/2014 First Reading Judicial Proceedings 47
Senate 4/02/2014 4/03/2014 Favorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
Senate 4/04/2014 3/26/2014 Favorable Report Adopted 60
Senate 4/04/2014 3/26/2014 Second Reading Passed 60
Senate 4/07/2014 3/28/2014 Third Reading Passed (46-0) 62
House 4/07/2014 4/01/2014 Returned Passed 68
Post Passage 4/14/2014 4/14/2014 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 238
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   6-202 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:29 PM