Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Health Occupations - Requirements for the Practice of Optometry - Miscellaneous Revisions
Sponsored by
Delegates K. Young, Krimm, Pendergrass, and Turner
Status
In the House - Referred to interim study by Health and Government Operations
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Requiring that, in addition to being licensed, an individual be certified under specified provisions of law and the Act before practicing optometry in the State within the scope of the certification; requiring specified optometrists to be certified under specified provisions of law before performing specified functions; altering the coursework requirements for specified certifications; establishing a new level of certification for licensed optometrists; etc.
Committees
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0611
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2017
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/03/2017
Legislative Date
2/03/2017
Action
First Reading Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/03/2017
Legislative Date
2/03/2017
Action
Hearing 2/15 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/06/2017
Legislative Date
2/06/2017
Action
Hearing canceled
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/06/2017
Legislative Date
2/06/2017
Action
Hearing 2/21 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/14/2017
Legislative Date
3/14/2017
Action
Referred to interim study by Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/03/2017 2/03/2017 First Reading Health and Government Operations
Text - First - Health Occupations - Requirements for the Practice of Optometry - Miscellaneous Revisions
House 2/03/2017 2/03/2017 Hearing 2/15 at 1:00 p.m.
House 2/06/2017 2/06/2017 Hearing canceled
House 2/06/2017 2/06/2017 Hearing 2/21 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Health and Government Operations
House 3/14/2017 3/14/2017 Referred to interim study by Health and Government Operations
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   11-101, 11-301, 11-309, 11-402 through 11-404, 11-404.1, 11-404.2, 11-404.3 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:31 PM