Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Transportation – Highway User Revenues – Distribution
Sponsored by
Delegates Beidle, Anderton, Adams, Arentz, Barve, Beitzel, Fraser-Hidalgo, Ghrist, Holmes, Hornberger, Jacobs, Jalisi, Lafferty, McCray, Morgan, Otto, Pena-Melnyk, Rose, Shoemaker, Stein, Tarlau, Carr, Cassilly, Clark, Flanagan, Folden, Frush, Gilchrist, Healey, R. Lewis, McMillan, Robinson, Wivell, and K. Young
Status
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 330
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Altering the amounts of and process for appropriating highway user funds that are required to be distributed to Baltimore City, counties, and municipalities in certain fiscal years; requiring that certain capital highway grants may be made only under certain circumstances; requiring that in certain fiscal years highway user revenues are required to be used as authorized under the Transportation Trust Fund; repealing certain obsolete distributions of highway user revenues and transfers of highway user revenues for certain fiscal years; etc.
Committees
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0516
Introduced in a prior session as: HB0942 Session: 2017 Regular Session
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2018, July 1, 2019
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/01/2018
Legislative Date
2/01/2018
Action
First Reading Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/01/2018
Legislative Date
2/01/2018
Action
Hearing 2/22 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Transportation – Highway User Revenues – Distribution
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/05/2018
Legislative Date
3/05/2018
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/06/2018
Legislative Date
3/06/2018
Action
Favorable with Amendments {480411/1 Adopted
Proceedings
40
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/06/2018
Legislative Date
3/06/2018
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
40
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Third - Transportation – Highway User Revenues – Distribution
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/08/2018
Legislative Date
3/08/2018
Action
Third Reading Passed (137-0)
Proceedings
42
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/09/2018
Legislative Date
3/09/2018
Action
Referred Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
43
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/14/2018
Legislative Date
3/14/2018
Action
Hearing 3/22 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/15/2018
Legislative Date
3/15/2018
Action
Hearing canceled
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/15/2018
Legislative Date
3/15/2018
Action
Hearing 3/29 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/30/2018
Legislative Date
3/30/2018
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/30/2018
Legislative Date
3/27/2018
Action
Favorable with Amendments {659736/1 Adopted
Proceedings
58
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/30/2018
Legislative Date
3/27/2018
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
58
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/02/2018
Legislative Date
3/28/2018
Action
Third Reading Passed (46-0)
Proceedings
59
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/05/2018
Legislative Date
3/27/2018
Action
House Concurs Senate Amendments
Proceedings
61
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/05/2018
Legislative Date
3/27/2018
Action
Third Reading Passed (137-0)
Proceedings
61
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/05/2018
Legislative Date
3/27/2018
Action
Passed Enrolled
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Enrolled - Transportation – Highway User Revenues – Distribution
Proceedings
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
4/24/2018
Legislative Date
4/24/2018
Action
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 330
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Chapter - Transportation – Highway User Revenues – Distribution
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/01/2018 2/01/2018 First Reading Environment and Transportation
House 2/01/2018 2/01/2018 Hearing 2/22 at 1:00 p.m.
Text - First - Transportation – Highway User Revenues – Distribution
Vote - House - Committee - Environment and Transportation
House 3/05/2018 3/05/2018 Favorable with Amendments Report by Environment and Transportation
House 3/06/2018 3/06/2018 Favorable with Amendments {480411/1 Adopted 40
House 3/06/2018 3/06/2018 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 40
Text - Third - Transportation – Highway User Revenues – Distribution
House 3/08/2018 3/08/2018 Third Reading Passed (137-0) 42
Senate 3/09/2018 3/09/2018 Referred Budget and Taxation 43
Senate 3/14/2018 3/14/2018 Hearing 3/22 at 1:00 p.m.
Senate 3/15/2018 3/15/2018 Hearing canceled
Senate 3/15/2018 3/15/2018 Hearing 3/29 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - Senate - Committee - Budget and Taxation
Senate 3/30/2018 3/30/2018 Favorable with Amendments Report by Budget and Taxation
Senate 3/30/2018 3/27/2018 Favorable with Amendments {659736/1 Adopted 58
Senate 3/30/2018 3/27/2018 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 58
Senate 4/02/2018 3/28/2018 Third Reading Passed (46-0) 59
House 4/05/2018 3/27/2018 House Concurs Senate Amendments 61
House 4/05/2018 3/27/2018 Third Reading Passed (137-0) 61
House 4/05/2018 3/27/2018 Passed Enrolled
Text - Enrolled - Transportation – Highway User Revenues – Distribution
Post Passage 4/24/2018 4/24/2018 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 330
Text - Chapter - Transportation – Highway User Revenues – Distribution
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   8-401, 8-402, 8-403, 8-404, 8-405 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:30 PM